US SR347 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S824-825)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S824-825)
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that it is U.S. policy: (1) that, in coordination with the government of Afghanistan, North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) member countries, and other allies in Afghanistan, the President shall complete the accelerated transition of U.S. military and security operations to such government and redeploy U.S. Armed Forces from Afghanistan by December 31, 2014; and (2) to pursue diplomatic efforts leading to a political settlement and reconciliation of the internal conflict in Afghanistan. Expresses the sense of the Senate that, should the President determine the necessity to maintain U.S. troops in Afghanistan to carry out missions after December 31, 2014, any such presence and missions should be authorized by a separate vote of Congress not later than June 1, 2014.
Title
A resolution providing for completion of the accelerated transition of United States combat and military and security operations to the Government of Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S824-825) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Alliances
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers
Alliances
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/347/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres347/BILLS-113sres347is.pdf |