US SR606 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2700; text: CR S2699)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2700; text: CR S2699)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates May 5, 2020, as the National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls.
Title
A resolution designating May 5, 2020, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Native Women and Girls".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2700; text: CR S2699) |
Same As/Similar To
HR950 (Related) 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SR144 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/4/2019 S2279-2280)
SR144 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/4/2019 S2279-2280)
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Violent crime
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/606/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres606/BILLS-116sres606ats.pdf |