US SR781 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4861-4862)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4861-4862)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the seriousness of polycystic ovary syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "PCOS Awareness Month."
Title
A resolution recognizing the seriousness of polycystic ovary syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "PCOS Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4878; text: CR S4861-4862) |
Same As/Similar To
HR471 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR878 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR325 (Related) 2021-09-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 7/28/2021 CR S5144-5145)
HR878 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR325 (Related) 2021-09-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 7/28/2021 CR S5144-5145)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/781/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres781/BILLS-117sres781ats.pdf |