US SR785 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10099; text: 09/20/2022 CR S4864-4865)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10099; text: 09/20/2022 CR S4864-4865)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 30, 2022, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Title
A resolution designating October 30, 2022, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10099; text: 09/20/2022 CR S4864-4865) |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR434 (Related) 2021-10-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S7465)
SR438 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: 11/03/2021 CR S7723-7724)
SR438 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: 11/03/2021 CR S7723-7724)