UT HB0097 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean Fuel Vehicle Tax Credit Modifications
Title
Clean Fuel Vehicle Tax Credit Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2013-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0097.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0097.pdf |