UT HB0253 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion Amendments
Title
Abortion Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Abortion
Community Health Clinics
Department of Health
Genetic Counselors
Health
Health Care Data and Informatics
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Health Care Statistics
Hospitals
Maternal and Child Health
Midwives
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians and Surgeons
Community Health Clinics
Department of Health
Genetic Counselors
Health
Health Care Data and Informatics
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Health Care Statistics
Hospitals
Maternal and Child Health
Midwives
Nurses
Physician Assistants
Physicians and Surgeons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 21 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 7 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 7 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 7 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |