UT HB0379 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational Licensing Amendments
Title
Occupational Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-10 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-10 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCLERK | |
2012-02-09 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-07 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0379.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/hbillint/hb0379.pdf |