UT HB0426 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide Energy Policy Amendments
Title
Statewide Energy Policy Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Appropriations
Department of Natural Resources
Economic Development
Energy
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Grant Programs and Incentives
Higher Education
Technology
Appropriations
Department of Natural Resources
Economic Development
Energy
Governor's Office of Energy Development
Grant Programs and Incentives
Higher Education
Technology