UT HB0570 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Facility Amendments
Title
Health Care Facility Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health and Human Services
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Human Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Hospitals
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Human Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Hospitals