UT SB0057 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Control - Exception for Community Cat Management Initiative
Title
Animal Control - Exception for Community Cat Management Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ lifted from standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0057.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0057.pdf |