UT SB0060 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Lieutenant Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Lieutenant Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drug Paraphernalia Amendments
Title
Drug Paraphernalia Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Plumb [D] | Rep. Steve Eliason [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Lieutenant Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-08 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Crimes
Health and Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Substance Abuse
Crimes
Health and Human Services
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Punishment
Substance Abuse