UT SB0068 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solid Waste Amendments - Financial Assurance Requirements
Title
Solid Waste Amendments - Financial Assurance Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in SSUB | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTNAE | |
2011-02-07 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTNAE | |
2011-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE | |
2011-02-04 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0068.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0068.pdf |