UT SB0078 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public School Early Graduation Counseling
Title
Public School Early Graduation Counseling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2011-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-01 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-02-25 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-21 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-17 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |