UT SB0176 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Candidate Party Affiliation
Title
Candidate Party Affiliation
Sponsors
Sen. Ben McAdams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-18 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |