UT SB0180 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ to Senate in SSEC
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Exploitation of a Vulnerable Adult
Title
Sexual Exploitation of a Vulnerable Adult
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-10 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |