UT SB0210 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Optometrist Practice Amendments
Title
Optometrist Practice Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Health and Human Services
Health Care Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Optometrists
Physicians and Surgeons
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Health and Human Services
Health Care Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Optometrists
Physicians and Surgeons