UT SB0275 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing Signature from Initiative and Referendum Petition
Title
Removing Signature from Initiative and Referendum Petition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0275.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0275.pdf |