VA HB1 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rights of unborn children. Provides that unborn children at every stage of development enjoy all the rights, privileges, and immunities available to other persons, citizens, and residents of the Commonwealth, subject only to the laws and Constitutions of Virginia and the United States, precedents of the United States Supreme Court, and provisions to the contrary in the statutes of the Commonwealth.
Title
Unborn children; construing the word "person" under Virginia law to include.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASS BY (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Pursuant to rule 20(g) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Recommitted to Education and Health | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (24-Y 14-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Passed House (66-Y 32-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-13 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASS BY (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Motion to pass by Amendment by Delegate Watts agreed to (64-Y 34-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Speaker ruled floor Substitute by Delegate McClellan not germane 12105413D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Floor substitute printed 12105413D-H1 (McClellan) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N) | |
2011-11-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-11-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100423D |