VA HB1015 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; law-enforcement agencies; response to sexual assault. Permits each public institution of higher education or nonprofit private institution of higher education to request the cooperation of the primary law-enforcement agency of the locality in which the institution is located to establish a written memorandum of understanding with such law-enforcement agency to address the prevention of and response to criminal sexual assault and requires such law-enforcement agency to cooperate in establishing such memorandum of understanding.
Title
Higher educational institutions; memorandum of understanding with local law-enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1015ER) |
2016-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1015H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104685D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104685D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102729D |