VA HB1040 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; small employers. Exempts employers that are individuals or entities with 10 or fewer employees from the state minimum wage requirements.
Title
Minimum wage; small employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101296D |