VA HB1056 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources; coastal resilience policy; research university collaborative. Requires the Secretary of Natural and Historic Resources and all relevant agencies, when setting coastal resilience policies, issuing permits, and evaluating grant proposals to seek input and consultation from the Commonwealth's research university collaborative. Current law permits the Secretary to seek input and consultation from such collaborative when setting coastal resilience policies. The bill removes the Virginia Coastal Policy Center from such collaborative and provides that such collaborative may include any other institution in the Commonwealth conducting coastal resilience research. The bill also requires the Secretary to utilize such collaborative's expertise, research, and data analysis for the implementation of water management techniques and coastal resilience strategies. Under current law, such requirements by the Secretary are permissive.
Title
Coastal resilience policy; consultation from research university collaborative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102111D |