VA HB1070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expectorating in public places; repeal. Repeals the crime of expectorating in public places.
Title
Expectorating in public places; repeals the crime.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Michael Webert [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N) (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (13-Y 25-N) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (13-Y 25-N) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (14-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Pending question, not ordered (13-Y 25-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101993D |