VA HB1075 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; premiums based on credit information. Prohibits insurers from setting rates for motor vehicle insurance on the basis of a person's credit history or credit score. The measure will become effective January 1, 2011.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; premiums based on credit information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101893D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1075 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1075+hil |