VA HB1075 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospital discharge; follow-up care. Requires hospitals to educate patients, and in certain circumstances their families, about follow-up care, treatment, and services upon discharge. The bill also requires community services boards to provide information to hospitals about alcohol and substance abuse services available to minors.
Title
Hospital discharge procedures; community services boards to provide information on certain services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180) | |
2012-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 180 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1075ER) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1075H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104772D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104772D-H1 | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101350D |
Same As/Similar To
SB201 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Health
Minors
Narcotics and Drugs
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Health
Minors
Narcotics and Drugs