VA HB1085 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; earned income tax credit. Extends the period in which low-income taxpayers may take advantage of the enhanced earned income tax credit, from taxable years beginning prior to January 1, 2013, to taxable years beginning prior to January 1, 2018. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Income tax, state; earned income tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2014-02-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 2/5/14) | |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-01-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1085ER) |
2014-01-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-14 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-13 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 14103646D |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Same As) 2014-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)