VA HB1087 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Recognition Experts. Provides that in any trial for a violation of Article 1 (§18.2-247 et seq.) of Chapter 7 of Title 18.2 (drug offenses) involving cocaine or heroin, any law-enforcement officer shall be permitted to testify as to the results of any field test approved as accurate and reliable by the Department of Forensic Science regarding whether or not any substance, the identity of which is at issue, is cocaine or heroin and provides that any law-enforcement officer who performs drug field tests shall be trained as a Drug Recognition Expert by the Department of Forensic Science.
Title
Drug recognition experts; law-enforcement officer be trained by Department of Forensic Science.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102493D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1087 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1087+hil |