VA HB1103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited drug analogs; Board of Pharmacy may regulate; prohibition on sale; civil penalty. Authorizes the Board of Pharmacy to add substances that are considered prohibited drug analogs through an expedited regulatory process. A "prohibited drug analog" is defined as a substance that the Board has determined to have or is represented or intended to have a stimulant, depressant, or hallucinogenic effect on the central nervous system that is substantially similar to or greater than the stimulant, depressant, or hallucinogenic effect on the central nervous system of tetrahydrocannibinol or a controlled substance. The bill provides that any person that sells, gives, or distributes a prohibited drug analog is civilly liable to law enforcement for the actual expenses incurred by law enforcement to purchase the prohibited drug analog and is subject to a civil penalty of $1,000 for a first offense, $2,000 for a second offense, and $5,000 for a third or subsequent offense. If the expenses and civil penalty are not paid within 30 days of the judgment, any license or registration to conduct business of the person or entity liable shall be suspended. Upon conviction of a third offense, such license or registration to conduct business shall be forfeited. This bill is carried over pursuant to Rule 22 of the House.
Title
Drug analogs, prohibited; Board of Pharmacy may regulate, prohibition on sale, civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-30 | House | Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103498D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 187 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3443 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3456.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3456.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1103 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1103+hil |