VA HB1106 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disclosure of insurance policy limits; wrongful death action. Allows the personal representative of the estate of a decedent who died as a result of a motor vehicle accident, or his attorney, to request the disclosure of the liability limits of an insurance policy prior to filing a civil action for wrongful death resulting from a motor vehicle accident. The party requesting this information shall provide the insurer with (i) the date of the accident, (ii) the name and last known address of the alleged tortfeasor, (iii) a copy of the accident report, if any, (iv) the claim number, if available, and (v) the decedent's death certificate; the certificate of qualification of the personal representative of the decedent's estate; the names and relationship of the statutory beneficiaries of the decedent; medical bills, if any; and a description of the source, amount, and payment history of the claimed income loss for each beneficiary. The bill also provides that disclosure of a policy's limits shall not constitute an admission that the alleged injury is subject to the policy.
Title
Insurance policy limits; allows personal representative of estate of decedent to request disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1106ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1106H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104678D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104678D-H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100146D |