VA HB1107 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permit reciprocity; report. Provides that any agreement for reciprocal recognition of concealed handgun or concealed weapons permits or licenses that was valid as of December 1, 2015, shall be valid until June 1, 2017. The bill requires the Crime Commission to submit a report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2016, regarding the requirements and qualifications for receiving a concealed weapons permit in Virginia as compared to other states.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; reciprocity, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103763D |