VA HB111 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Accreditation of schools; delayed implementation of certain statutes and regulations, etc. Provides for the delayed implementation of statutes and regulations upon which the accreditation of schools in the Commonwealth is based that were not already in effect on June 30, 2008, with the exception of the graduation and completion rate index, until July 1, 2011, unless such statutes or regulations are also specifically required by federal code, federal regulation, or court action. This bill incorporates
Title
Schools; delayed implementation of statutes and regulations upon which full accreditation is based.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Matthew Lohr [R] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 398 (effective - see bill) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB111ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Delegates: Lohr, Cole, Carr | |
2010-03-02 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Senators: Miller, J.C., Locke, Blevins | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-01 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 96-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB111H1 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104414D-H1 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104414D-H1 | |
2010-01-20 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102153D |
Same As/Similar To
HB575 (Similar To) 2010-01-20 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB111-Lohr) by voice vote
SB352 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
SB352 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)