VA HB1110 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant law; dwelling units. Allows a plaintiff in an unlawful detainer action to submit copies of the lease under certain circumstances. The bill also (i) removes the four-residential-unit limitation on the exemption of an owner who performs mold inspection or remediation from licensure as a mold inspector or remediator; (ii) revises the definition of dwelling unit; (iii) allows a tenant to stay in the dwelling unit after foreclosure of the property containing the dwelling unit under certain circumstances; (iv) provides that in unlawful detainer actions, the proceeding shall be dismissed under certain conditions if the tenant pays the landlord or his attorney, or pays into court all (a) rent due and owing as of the court date, (b) damages and other charges contracted for in the rental agreement, (c) late charges contracted for in the rental agreement, (d) reasonable attorney fees, and (e) costs of the proceeding; and (v) allows the landlord to recover from the tenant the tenant's prorated share of the actual costs of other insurance coverages provided by the landlord relative to the premises, including the landlord's administrative or other fees associated with the administration of such coverages.
Title
Landlord and tenant laws; dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 788 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1110ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 2-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1110ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12105213D-EH1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1110EH1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Amendments by Delegate Greason agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105213D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105213D-H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102541D |