VA HB1123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling and unlawful gaming; Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Investigation Unit; penalties. Increases criminal penalties for various violations of illegal gambling and unlawful gaming. The bill also establishes the Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Investigation Unit (the Unit) within the Department of State Police. The bill establishes the Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Fund for the purpose of funding the activities of the Unit. Illegal gambling and unlawful gaming; Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Investigation Unit; penalties. Increases criminal penalties for various violations of illegal gambling and unlawful gaming. The bill also establishes the Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Investigation Unit (the Unit) within the Department of State Police. The bill establishes the Illegal Gambling and Unlawful Gaming Fund for the purpose of funding the activities of the Unit.
Title
Illegal gambling and unlawful gaming; increases criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104309D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 328 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 331.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |