VA HB1139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority; land and utility ownership. Removes the number of acres and the instrument number of the quitclaim deed recorded in the Clerk's Office of the Circuit Court of the City of Hampton on June 14, 2013, in reference to the area that is known as Fort Monroe and redefines such area to be what is shown in the land records of the City of Hampton as being owned by the Commonwealth, whether in the name of the Commonwealth or the Fort Monroe Authority.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority; land and utility ownership.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1139ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1139H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105820D-H1 |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105820D-H1 |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102180D |
Same As/Similar To
SB90 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)