VA HB1143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming child pornography as child sexual abuse material. Replaces all instances of "child pornography" in the Code with "child sexual abuse material."
Title
Child pornography; renaming as child sexual abuse material in the Code.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102639D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 356 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 270.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 390.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 70.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
42 | 1 | 36.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |