VA HB115 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking in cars with a minor present; civil penalty. Makes it unlawful for a person to smoke in a motor vehicle with a child under the age of 13 present; punishable by a civil penalty of $100.
Title
Smoking in cars with a minor present; civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2012-01-03 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-03 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102552D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB115 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB115+hil |