VA HB121 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Housing Trust Fund Authority. Creates the Virginia Housing Trust Fund Authority to administer the Virginia Housing Trust Fund also created by the bill to assist in increasing the capacity of community housing organizations and encourage private sector businesses and individuals to contribute capital to community-based housing organizations and assist them in providing safe, decent, and affordable housing to Virginia citizens. The bill sets the powers and duties of the Authority and its Board of Directors, and the lawful purposes for which the Fund may be used.
Title
Virginia Housing Trust Fund Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-10 | House: Incorporates HB790 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104678D-H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102519D |