VA HB1213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; military service; prepaid applications. Decreases from 450 to 150 the number of prepaid applications required for the consideration, development, and issuance of a special license plate when such special license plate relates to military service.
Title
License plates, special; decreases prepaid applications related to military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Department of Motor Vehicles |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100250D |