VA HB1216 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Planning time for school teachers. Requires school boards to ensure that all school teachers are provided at least three hours a week of unencumbered, self-directed planning time.
Title
Planning time for school teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-01-30 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education (Tata) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-28 | House: Reported from Education with amendments (18-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088391756 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1216 |