VA HB1216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State of good repair funds; bridges subject to repeated flooding. Makes bridges that are subject to repeated flooding eligible for state of good repair funding. Under current law, structurally deficient bridges and highways with deficient pavement conditions are eligible for state of good repair funds.
Title
State of good repair funds; bridges subject to repeated flooding.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100138D |