VA HB1219 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Board; Virginia Condominium Act; Virginia Real Estate Time-Share Act; common interest communities. Authorizes the Common Interest Community Board to terminate inactive condominium or time-share registrations. In addition, the bill clarifies the authority of the Common Interest Community Ombudsman to assist individual members of common interest communities regarding rights and processes available under applicable laws and regulations. The bill also makes technical amendments.
Title
Common Interest Community Board; authorized to terminate inactive condominium, etc., registrations.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1219ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1219ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12101132D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1219E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12101132D |
Same As/Similar To
SB472 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)