VA HB1229 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Continued to 2011 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Continued to 2011 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; active duty military students. Provides that students called to active military duty during an academic semester shall have the opportunity to return to the institution upon completion of the active duty military assignment, without having to reapply for admission. Also, if the student had previously been accepted to any of the institution's graduate programs, the student may defer acceptance until his return.
Title
Higher educational institutions; active duty military students may return without reapplying.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | House: Continued to 2011 in Education by voice vote | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103311D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1229 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1229+hil |