VA HB1237 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB559-Bell) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB559-Bell) by voice vote
Summary
Mentally ill defendants; treatment and hospitalization. Establishes a new standard for hospitalizing mentally ill criminal defendants. Hospitalization may occur when the defendant has a mental illness and there exists a substantial likelihood that, as a result of that mental illness, the defendant will, in the near future, cause serious physical harm to himself or others as evidenced by recent behavior causing, attempting, or threatening harm. Under current law the standard is "imminently dangerous to himself or others." The provision applies to pretrial, after conviction but before sentencing, and after sentencing. The bill specifies that the evaluation must be done face-to-face by an employee of the community services board or its designee who is skilled in the assessment and treatment of mental illness and has completed a certification program approved by the Department of Mental Health, Mental Retardation and Substance Abuse Services. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Inmates; emergency psychiatric treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-25 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB559-Bell) by voice vote | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084760820 |
Same As/Similar To
HB559 (Similar To) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1237 |