VA HB1237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of trust business. Clarifies the definition of "trust business" to specify that engaging in trust business does not include rendering services as an individual attorney at law or through an entity wholly owned by attorneys at law in the performance of duties as a fiduciary. Definition of trust business. Clarifies the definition of "trust business" to specify that engaging in trust business does not include rendering services as an individual attorney at law or through an entity wholly owned by attorneys at law in the performance of duties as a fiduciary.
Title
Financial institutions; definition of trust business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1237ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1237H1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105427D-H1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105427D-H1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104791D |