VA HB1244 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; study concerning Potomac River crossings. Requires VDOT to consider the results of a study regarding Potomac River crossings between Virginia and Maryland. The study shall provide data on congestion for the region, and if it recommends a crossing, then a report shall be provided to the General Assembly by December 1, 2015.
Title
Potomac River; VDOT to consider results of a demand study concerning crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104164D |
Subjects
Maryland
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors