VA HB1244 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; service charges for in-person transactions. Eliminates the service charge imposed and collected by the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) for any registration, driver's license, or identification card renewal in a DMV service center.
Title
Motor Vehicles, Department of; service charges for in-person transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Ad Hoc Subcommittee #4 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102888D |