VA HB1244 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that for the purposes of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Act (the Act), "telephone solicitation call" includes any text message sent to any wireless telephone with a Virginia area code, or to a wireless telephone registered to any natural person who is a resident of the Commonwealth, for the purpose of offering or advertising any property, goods, or services for sale, lease, license, or investment, including offering or advertising an extension of credit or for the purpose of fraudulent activity. The bill prohibits a telephone solicitor from engaging in any conduct that results in the display of false or misleading caller identification information on the called party's telephone. The bill increases the amount of damages and the amount of the civil penalty for violations of the Act from $500 for each such violation to $500 for a first violation, $1,000 for a second violation, and $5,000 for each subsequent violation and increases to $5,000 the maximum civil penalty the court may impose for a willful first or second violation.
Title
Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act; telephone solicitation calls.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1244ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105168D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1244E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105168D |
Same As/Similar To
SB812 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |