VA HB1244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; electric vehicle charging infrastructure and rooftop solar energy collection device installation; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission to evaluate by locality the availability and accessibility of electric vehicle (EV) charging infrastructure and rooftop solar energy collection device installation to residents of the Commonwealth. The Commission shall report the findings of its evaluation and analysis by December 1, 2022, to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Commerce and Energy and the Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor.
Title
State Corporation Commission; electric vehicle charging infrastructure & rooftop solar energy, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104567D |
Subjects
Counties Cities and Towns
Electric Vehicles
Infrastructure
Solar Energy
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Electric Vehicles
Infrastructure
Solar Energy
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation