VA HB1252 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apprenticeship program; discrimination. Prohibits a sponsor of a registered apprenticeship program from discriminating against an apprentice or applicant for apprenticeship on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, age, genetic information, or disability. The measure conforms Virginia's apprenticeship nondiscrimination requirements to those required for state apprenticeship agencies pursuant to federal Office of Apprenticeship regulations adopted in 2016.
Title
Registered apprenticeship programs; prohibited discrimination.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (65-Y 29-N) (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1228) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1228 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1252ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (65-Y 29-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (65-Y 29-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1252ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1252H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106433D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106433D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102856D |