VA HB1283 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Students with individualized education programs or Section 504 Plans; emergency protocol and guide. Requires a protocol for individualized accommodations and supports during emergency situations at school and a step-by-step guide on how to execute such protocol to be included in each individualized education program implemented for a public school student with a disability in accordance with the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act and in each Section 504 Plan implemented for a public school student in accordance with § 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973 and provided to all of such student's teachers for implementation.
Title
Students with individualized education programs or Section 504 Plans; emergency protocol and guide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101494D |