VA HB1287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of crimes; conviction required. Requires that any action for the forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of a crime be stayed until the person whose property is the subject of the forfeiture action has been convicted of the crime authorizing the forfeiture and has exhausted all appeals. The bill provides that property may be forfeited even though no final conviction order is entered if (i) the forfeiture is ordered by the court pursuant to a plea agreement or (ii) the owner of the property has not submitted a written demand for the return of the property within one year from the date the property was seized.
Title
Forfeiture of property used in connection with commission of crimes; conviction required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (9-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1287H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104038D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB1468 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104038D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-09-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100438D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Similar To) 2015-01-28 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 386.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |